List of Chief Minister of Delhi:
1. Chaudhary P. Brahm Parkash
Elected from / constituency: Nangloi Jat
Term in Office: 17 March 1952 to 12 February 1955
Political Party: Indian National Congress
Lt. Governor: Shankar Prasada
Related: Drug Knowledge and Awareness Quiz
2. Gurmukh Nihal Singh
Elected from / constituency: Daryaganj
Term in Office: 13 February 1955 to 31 October 1956
Political Party: Indian National Congress
Lt. Governor: Shankar Prasada
As per States Reorganization Act, (1956) Delhi was made a Union Territory which works directly under President of India.
In 1991, Government of National Capital Territory of Delhi Act came into effect and Delhi is declared as Union Territory of Delhi (special state status which is also known as National Capital Territory of Delhi.
3. Madan Lal Khurana
Elected from / constituency: Moti Nagar
Term in Office: 2 December 1993 to 26 February 1996
Political Party: Bharatiya Janata Party
Lt. Governor: Prasannabhai Karunashankar Dave
Related: Human Population Quizzes Online
4. Sahib Singh Verma
Elected from / constituency: Shalimar Bagh
Term in Office: 27 February 1996 to 12 October 1998
Political Party: Bharatiya Janata Party
Lt. Governor: Prasannabhai Karunashankar Dave
Related: List of all Chief Ministers of Uttar Pradesh State
5. Sushma Swaraj
Elected from / constituency: didn’t
Term in Office: 13 October 1998 to 3 December 1998
Political Party: Bharatiya Janata Party
Lt. Governor: Vijai Kapoor
Related: Muslims and Islam Knowledge Quiz
6. Sheila Dikshit
Elected from / constituency: New Delhi
Term in Office: 4 December 1998 to 1 December 2003
Lt. Governor: Vijai Kapoor
Consecutive Term in Office: 2 December 2003 to 29 November 2008
Lt. Governor: Vijai Kapoor
Consecutive Term in Office: 30 November 2008 to 27 December 2013
Lt. Governor: Tejendra Khanna
Political Party: Indian National Congress
Related: Lists of countries by mineral production
7. Arvind Kejriwal
Elected from / constituency: New Delhi
Term in Office: 28 December 2013 to 14 February 2014
Political Party: Aam Aadmi Party
Lt. Governor: Najeeb Jung
-President’s rule from 15 February 2014 to 13 February 2015-
8. Arvind Kejriwal
Elected from / constituency: New Delhi
Term in Office: 14 February 2015 to 15 February 2020
Consecutive Term in Office: 30 16 February 2020 to till date.
Political Party: Aam Aadmi Party
Lt. Governor: Anil Baijal
Thank you for this information!